Global Patent Index - EP 0988813 A1

EP 0988813 A1 2000-03-29 - Additional shelf

Title (en)

Additional shelf

Title (de)

Zusatztablett

Title (fr)

Tablette d'appoint

Publication

EP 0988813 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410101 A

Priority

FR 9810893 A

Abstract (en)

The extra flap (1) forms a complementary surface which extends the main table top (3). It comprises fixings (MF) enabling the complementary shelf to be fitted as an extension to the table top.

Abstract (fr)

1. Tablette d'appoint (1) formée d'un plateau complémentaire (2) destiné à prolonger le plateau principal (3) d'une table (4), caractérisée en ce qu'elle comporte des moyens de fixation (MF) permettant la fixation du plateau complémentaire (2) dans le prolongement du plateau principal (3) de manière à. positionner les faces supérieures (2a, 3a) respectives de chacun des plateaux (2, 3) dans un même plan de référence horizontal (H). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 1/04; A47B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 1/04 (2013.01); A47B 2220/0038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783141 A1 20000317; FR 2783141 B1 20001124; EP 0988813 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI