Global Patent Index - EP 0988817 A1

EP 0988817 A1 2000-03-29 - Method and device for erecting rod-like devices, in particular Christmas trees

Title (en)

Method and device for erecting rod-like devices, in particular Christmas trees

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Aufständerung von stangenförmigen Gegenständen, insbesondere von Tannenbäumen, und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour ériger des dispositifs en forme de barre, en particulier des arbres de Noel

Publication

EP 0988817 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118418 A

Priority

DE 19843725 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19843725C1] The method of supporting a Christmas tree involves cutting cross cuts (5,6) in the trunk of the tree at different levels. Stands (9,10) are provided to engage the cut outs to form a cross shaped support for the tree.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Aufständerung von stangenförmigen Gegenständen insbesondere Tannenbäume (2), wobei in einem ersten Schritt das Stamm- oder Stangenende (1) mittels Werkzeuge (3,4) derart bearbeitet wird, dass zur Längsachse des Baumstammes querverlaufende Ausnehmungen (5,6) jeweils mit einem der Werkzeuge (3,4) eingearbeitet werden, wobei die Ausnehmungen (5,6) am Stamm auf unterschiedlichen Niveaus (7,8) gelegt werden und wobei die Ausnehmungen (5,6) zueinander senkrecht verlaufend in den Niveaus (7,8) angelegt werden, und wobei in einem zweiten Schritt Ständerelemente (9,10) angebracht werden, welche an die Niveaus (7,8) der Ausnehmungen (5,6) angepaßt sind und die Ständerelemente (9,10) mit den Ausnehmungen (5,6) in Wirkverbindung gebracht werden, so dass sich ein kreuzartiger Ständerfuß mit einer Standfläche ergibt. Infolge dieses Verfahrens ist es möglich, kostengünstig fertig geständerte Bäume anzubieten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 33/12; B27F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 33/12 (2006.01); B27F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 33/12 (2013.01); B27F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843725 C1 19991209; EP 0988817 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020511

2001-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD, DEVICE AND STAND FOR ERECTING ROD-LIKE DEVICES, IN PARTICULAR CHRISTMAS TREES

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI