Global Patent Index - EP 0988824 A1

EP 0988824 A1 2000-03-29 - Dishwasher with a spray arm

Title (en)

Dishwasher with a spray arm

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem Sprüharm

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle avec bras de pulvérisation

Publication

EP 0988824 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115649 A

Priority

DE 19841355 A

Abstract (en)

Dishwasher has a spray arm (3) with a spray nozzle (5) arranged on top. A device is provided for adjusting the hollow spray stream.

Abstract (de)

In einer Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem Sprüharm (3) und einer darauf angeordneten Sprühdüse (5) wird eingeordnetes Spülgut mit einer Spülflüssigkeit mittels eines Sprühstrahls beaufschlagt, wobei der Sprühstrahl hohl ausgebildet ist. Dazu wird die Spülflüssigkeit der Sprühdüse (5) in einer Zirkulationsbewegung zugeführt. Da die Sprühdüse (5) einen im Vergleich zu herkömmlichen Sprühdüsen großen Durchmesser aufweist, ist sie unempfindlich gegen Verstopfen durch Speisereste. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4282 (2013.01); A47L 15/23 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841355 A1 20000316; DE 19841355 C2 20030116; EP 0988824 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060914

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020320

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI