Global Patent Index - EP 0988849 A1

EP 0988849 A1 2000-03-29 - BIDET

Title (en)

BIDET

Title (de)

BIDET

Title (fr)

BIDET

Publication

EP 0988849 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919649 A

Priority

  • JP 9802189 W
  • JP 17087597 A
  • JP 17087697 A

Abstract (en)

A bidet improved in operability and safety so as to be used more safely without fail than conventional bidets. A freely rotatable temperature checking hole (36) is provided around the external circumference of a water distribution pipe (5) branched from a faucet (40). The water stream is switched by a change-over valve (41) to check the temperature of hot water spouting from the temperature checking hole (36). A water supply pipe (14) is connected to an external cylinder (21) while a washing water conducting pipe (15) is connected to an internal cylinder (22), and a valve disc (23) is provided detachably at the lower end of the internal cylinder (22). After the temperature of hot water is checked, the lower end of the internal cylinder (22) is opened by pressing down the valve disc (23) with a push button (12) via a valve spindle (24), and washing water is thereby spouted from a jet nozzle (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 35/00; A47K 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852513 A1 19981126; AU 7239198 A 19981211; EP 0988849 A1 20000329; EP 0988849 A4 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050413

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61H 35/00 A, 7A 47K 3/22 B, 7E 03D 9/08 B

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT