Global Patent Index - EP 0988887 A1

EP 0988887 A1 2000-03-29 - Homogenizer with protecting device on the rotor

Title (en)

Homogenizer with protecting device on the rotor

Title (de)

Homogenisator mit Schutzvorrichtung auf dem Rotor

Title (fr)

Homogénisateur avec un dispositif de protection sur le rotor

Publication

EP 0988887 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116036 A

Priority

EP 98116036 A

Abstract (en)

A homogenizer for liquids and semi-liquids has a rotor (3) and a stator which have opposing concentric teeth (4, 5, 7, 8). Before the first stator teeth (7), the rotor (3) has an inner radial protective tooth (4) with rectangular openings (19) whose dimensions are equal to the minimum size of the foreign bodies to be excluded. The openings (19) have axially oriented wall surroundings (23, 26). In the first stator teeth array, the wall surfaces describe an angle of 0-90 degrees , preferably 0-40 degrees . The protective tooth (4) openings (19) are rectangular. In the axial direction, the protective tooth (4) has at least two, preferably three openings (19) on top of each other. Each axial row (20) of openings (19) is transposed w.r.t. the next axial row (21) of openings (21) by half the width of the opening plus the width of the respective separation crosspiece.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Homogenisator zum Homogenisieren fließfähiger Stoffe, mit einem Rotor (3) und einem Stator, die zueinander konzentrische Verzahnungen (4,5,7,8) aufweisen. Er ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Rotor (3) radial innen von der ersten Statorverzahnung (7) eine Schutzverzahnung (4) mit Öffnungen einer an die minimale Größe abzuhaltender Fremdkörper angepaßten lichten Weite aufweist. Der erfindungsgemäße Homogenisator ist gegen Beschädigungen durch in die Rotor/statorverzahnung eintretende harte Fremdkörper geschützt, ohne daß es zu einer Leistungsminderung gegenüber einem Homogenisator ohne eine solche Schutzeinrichtung kommt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/16; B01F 5/16; B02C 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00758 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822149 U1 19990408; DE 59807124 D1 20030313; EP 0988887 A1 20000329; EP 0988887 B1 20030205

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NETZSCH VAKUMIX GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VAKUMIX RUEHR- UND HOMOGENISIERTECHNIK AG, 28844 WEYHE, DE

- Document: DE 59807124

2015-07-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807124

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-03-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110825

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100916

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807124 P 20030313

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010921

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990702

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI