Global Patent Index - EP 0988895 A2

EP 0988895 A2 2000-03-29 - Vane wheel arrangement for air current roller mills

Title (en)

Vane wheel arrangement for air current roller mills

Title (de)

Schaufelkranz für Luftstrom-Wälzmühlen

Title (fr)

Anneau à aubes pour broyeurs à rouleaux à courant d'air

Publication

EP 0988895 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117649 A

Priority

DE 19844112 A

Abstract (en)

The blade ring is manufactured from a number of polygon segments which have planar surfaces and are preferably cut to size from metal sheets. To individual polygon segments can in each case be fixed with a predeterminable inclination one or more guide blades. Preferably an outer polygon segment ad an inner polygon segment with at least one guide blade form a polygon segment. Polygon segments can be linked to polygon runs and the latter to polygon blade rings with different diameters.

Abstract (de)

Zur Senkung der Herstellungskosten für Luftstrom-Wälzmühlen und vergleichbare Mühlen ist erfindungsgemäß ein segmentierter Polygon-Schaufelkranz (1) vorgesehen, welcher aus einer Vielzahl von Polygonsegmenten (5,6) hergestellt wird, wobei diese ebene Flächen aufweisen und vorzugsweise aus Blechen zugeschnitten werden. An den einzelnen Polygonsegmenten (5,6) können jeweils eine oder mehrere Leitschaufeln (4) mit einer vorgebbaren Neigung befestigt sein. Vorzugsweise bilden ein Aussen-Polygonsegment (5) und ein Innen-Polygonsegment (6) mit wenigstens einer Leitschaufel (4) ein Polygonsegment. Polygonsegmente können zu Polygonzügen und diese zu Polygon-Schaufelkränzen unterschiedlicher Durchmesser verbunden werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/04 (2006.01); B02C 15/00 (2006.01); B02C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988895 A2 20000329; EP 0988895 A3 20000531; EP 0988895 B1 20020529; CA 2283371 A1 20000325; CA 2283371 C 20041207; CZ 291326 B6 20030212; CZ 9903426 A3 20000412; DE 19844112 A1 20000330; DK 0988895 T3 20020909; ES 2177182 T3 20021201; JP 2000093821 A 20000404; JP 3403129 B2 20030506; US 6079646 A 20000627; ZA 9906064 B 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-04-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140912

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140904

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120907

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177182

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-07-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901534

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-04

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR IT

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FR IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR IT

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI