Global Patent Index - EP 0988898 A2

EP 0988898 A2 2000-03-29 - Thermal spray application of polymeric material

Title (en)

Thermal spray application of polymeric material

Title (de)

Verfahren zum thermischen Besprühen von polymeren Materialien

Title (fr)

Pulvérisation thermique de materiaux polymériques

Publication

EP 0988898 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307426 A

Priority

US 15906098 A

Abstract (en)

A PEEK composite may be applied to a metallic substrate (32) through an HVOF process. The metallic substrate (32) is prepared with a metallic bonding layer (34) that is arc sprayed onto its surface. A powderized PEEK composite material (36) is then heated and propelled against the substrate (32) and bonding layer (34) by a high velocity oxy fuel technique to uniformly coat the substrate (32). Following the HVOF process, the PEEK coating is annealed to provide a durable, PEEK-coated substrate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/10 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 4/04 (2006.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/18 (2013.01); B05D 1/10 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 4/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988898 A2 20000329; EP 0988898 A3 20010502; AR 021821 A1 20020807; CA 2283022 A1 20000323; CN 1256175 A 20000614; ID 24547 A 20000727; JP 2000096203 A 20000404; SG 108212 A1 20050128

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05D 1/08 A, 7B 05D 1/10 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI