Global Patent Index - EP 0988901 A1

EP 0988901 A1 2000-03-29 - Manufacturing method for stainless steel thin strip

Title (en)

Manufacturing method for stainless steel thin strip

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren eines dünnen Bandes aus rostfreiem stahl

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une bande mince en acier inoxydable

Publication

EP 0988901 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402235 A

Priority

FR 9811777 A

Abstract (en)

Manufacturing a thin strip of stainless steel comprises direct solidification of liquid steel in a casting installation comprising two cooled moving walls; solidification is finished when the strip leaves the walls; and hot laminating this strip using a rolling mill with cylinders having a diameter of 400-900 mm, the strip temperature after leaving the rolling mill is 800-1100 degrees C; the rate of reduction of the strip thickness during hot lamination is 15-50 %.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un procédé de fabrication d'une bande mince en acier inoxydable par solidification directe de l'acier liquide sous forme d'une bande d'épaisseur inférieure ou égale à 8 mm dans une installation de coulée comportant deux parois refroidies en mouvement et par laminage à chaud de ladite bande dont la solidification est substantiellement achevée lorsqu'elle quitte lesdites parois, caractérisé en ce que le laminage à chaud est effectué sur un laminoir dont les cylindres de travail ont un diamètre compris entre 400 et 900 mm, en ce que la température de la bande à sa sortie du laminoir est comprise entre 800 et 1100°C, et en ce que le taux de réduction de l'épaisseur de la bande lors du laminage à chaud est compris entre 15 et 50%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/40 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B21B 3/02 (2006.01); B21B 27/02 (2006.01); B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/46 (2013.01); B21B 1/463 (2013.01); B21B 1/466 (2013.01); B21B 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9601710 A1 19960125 - IPSCO INC [CA]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 531 (M - 1333) 30 October 1992 (1992-10-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 002 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 325 (M - 1148) 19 August 1991 (1991-08-19)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 012 26 December 1996 (1996-12-26)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 002 28 February 1997 (1997-02-28) & DATABASE WPI Week 9649, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 96-4927941964996-492794
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 418 (M - 1650) 5 August 1994 (1994-08-05)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988901 A1 20000329; EP 0988901 B1 20031112; AT 253992 T 20031115; AU 4877899 A 20000323; BR 9904278 A 20000926; CA 2281991 A1 20000321; CN 100358645 C 20080102; CN 1249216 A 20000405; DE 69912710 D1 20031218; DE 69912710 T2 20040923; FR 2783443 A1 20000324; FR 2783443 B1 20001027; ID 25947 A 20001116; JP 2000094006 A 20000404; KR 100573750 B1 20060424; KR 20000023300 A 20000425; PL 335499 A1 20000327; RU 2203749 C2 20030510; SK 123999 A3 20000711; TR 9902306 A2 20000421; TR 9902306 A3 20000421; TW 483781 B 20020421; UA 63941 C2 20010315; ZA 9905983 B 20010319

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040412

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *UGINE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-09-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ARCELOR FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-08-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *UGINE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CASTRIP LLC C/O NUCOR CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-09-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-05-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-05-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: USINOR

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-02-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-02-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-02-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-02-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-01-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: USINOR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69912710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-02-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020503

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI