Global patent index - EP 0988903 A1

EP 0988903 A1 2000-03-29 - Method of rolling a metal product

Title (en)

Method of rolling a metal product

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Walzen eines Metallproduktes

Title (fr)

Procédé de laminage d'un produit métallique

Publication

EP 0988903 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402297 A

Priority

FR 9811761 A

Abstract (en)

The process involves rolling a metal product in at least one rolling cage (1) associated with a calculation unit (4) comprising a calculator and a mathematical model for regulating the rolling force applied by the tightening apparatus (17). The installation used to implement the process comprises: (a) a rolling cage having two spaced columns (11); (b) at least two superposed working rolls (12, 12') between the columns of the cage; (c) device for control of feed of the product (2) for rolling in a rolling nip (22) delimited by two arcs of contact (20, 20') of the product (2) with the two rolls, between an inlet and an outlet section of the rolling nip (22); tightening apparatus (17) for applying pressure on the rolls and the cage to regulate the gap between the working rolls (12, 12') corresponding to a desired reduction in thickness and to maintain the gap during the rolling pass by applying between the working rolls (12, 12') a rolling force that depends on the mechanical and physical characteristics of the cage and the product and the conditions of passage of the metal in the rolling nip, and determines a yielding effect for different elements of the cage tending to augment the gap; and (d) devices (31, 32) controlled by a calculation unit (4) comprising a calculator (40) associated with a mathematical model, to regulate the tightening apparatus. Before each pass the calculation unit (4) associated with the mathematical model (40) determines a predictable value of the contraction stress of the metal corresponding to the deformation to be realized in the considered pass by taking into account during rolling the microcrystalline structure of the metal constituting the rolling product (2). The rolling force to be applied in order to obtain the desired thickness reduction is calculated before each pass as a function of the predictable value of the contraction stress and its development during rolling.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un procédé de laminage d'un produit métallique par passes successives dans au moins une cage de laminage (1) associée à une unité de calcul (4) comportant un calculateur et un modèle mathématique (40) pour le réglage de la force de laminage appliquée par les moyens de serrage (17). Conformément à l'invention, avant chaque passe (x), le calculateur associé au modèle mathématique détermine une valeur prévisible de la contrainte d'écoulement du métal correspondant à la déformation à réaliser dans la passe (x) considérée, en tenant compte de l'évolution, au cours du laminage, de la structure microcristalline du métal constituant le produit à laminer, et la force de laminage (Fx) à appliquer pour obtenir la réduction d'épaisseur souhaitée est calculée avant chaque passe (x) en fonction de la valeur ainsi prévue de la contrainte d'écoulement et de l'évolution de celle-ci pendant le laminage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] US 5086399 A 19920204 - TSUGENO MASASHI [JP], et al
  • [A] WO 9311886 A1 19930624 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 001 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [A] BIEGUS C ET AL: "ERMITTLUNG VON WERKSTOFFDATEN ZUR GEFUEGESIMULATION", STAHL UND EISEN, vol. 116, no. 5, 20 May 1996 (1996-05-20), pages 43 - 49, 145, XP000590152
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 168 (C - 236) 3 August 1984 (1984-08-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 203 (M - 103) 23 December 1981 (1981-12-23)
  • [A] G. SÖRGEL: "RECHNERGEFÜHRTES THERMOMECHANISCHES WALZEN IN GROBBLECHSTRASSEN", STAHL & EISEN, vol. 107, no. 20, 5 October 1987 (1987-10-05), pages 921 - 926, XP002102694
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 375 (M - 1010) 14 August 1990 (1990-08-14)
  • [A] PETIT B ET AL: "LA REUSSITE EPAISSEUR EN LAMINAGE A CHAUD ASSOCIEE AU CEDAGE ET A LA MECANIQUE CAGE", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, vol. 90, no. 10, 1 October 1993 (1993-10-01), pages 1255 - 1264, XP000417731
  • [A] KOKOVIKHIN Y I: "LIMITING CONDITIONS OF DRAWING IN SOLID AND ROLLER DIES", STEEL IN TRANSLATION, vol. 24, no. 12, 1 December 1994 (1994-12-01), pages 13 - 17, XP000527629

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988903 A1 20000329; EP 0988903 B1 20030502; AT 238852 T 20030515; DE 69907354 D1 20030605; DE 69907354 T2 20040401; ES 2193673 T3 20031101; FR 2783444 A1 20000324; FR 2783444 B1 20001215; JP 2000317511 A 20001121; US 6526328 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080910

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20080925

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060920

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VAI CLECIM

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060920

2007-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-09-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG, ABTEILUNG CT IP I&S

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CORUS TECHNOLOGY BV

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG, ABTEILUNG CT IP I&S

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-03-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS TECHNOLOGY BV

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 0988903E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193673

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-20 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-08-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-08-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAI CLECIM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI