Global patent index - EP 0988933 A2

EP 0988933 A2 2000-03-29 - Polishing disc

Title (en)

Polishing disc

Title (de)

Polierscheibe

Title (fr)

Disque de polissage

Publication

EP 0988933 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118345 A

Priority

DE 19843267 A

Abstract (en)

Polishing pad having a reverse side layer (4) is combined with a bur adhesive pad or layer on a polish plate. The polishing pad has a fibrous web (1) in which the fibers (10) extend singly or in fiber bundles (11) crosswise to the pad plane; a holding layer (2) which define a pad plane and a reverse side layer (4) which is fixed on to the holding layer (2). The waterproof adhesive (3) is present to fix the reverse side layer (4) on to the holding layer (2). A sufficient stiffness is imparted to provide form stability in the pad plane, combined with sufficient flexibility to provide suitable polishing surfaces so that the polishing pad can be reversed, if loading on its outlet position plane. The fibers (10) are 2 to 10mm long, are of fluff-free quality and anchored in the holding layer (2) so optionally dried polishing aid or polishing dust can be washed with water and the polishing pad after cleaning maintains its shape.

Abstract (de)

Polierscheibe mit kurzer Faserflorschicht (1) mit starker Bindung in einer Halteschicht (2). Eine Kletthaftschicht (4) ist auf der Rückseite der Polierscheibe angebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/14; B24D 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843267 A1 20000323; EP 0988933 A2 20000329; EP 0988933 A3 20011114; US 6408480 B1 20020625

INPADOC legal status

2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050902

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040319

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI