Global patent index - EP 0988934 A2

EP 0988934 A2 2000-03-29 - Crimping tool

Title (en)

Crimping tool

Title (de)

Crimpwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de sertissage

Publication

EP 0988934 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99870175 A

Priority

JP 23768598 A

Abstract (en)

In a crimping tool (10) that compresses a compressible object between dies (7a and 7b) by a toggle mechanism formed by a first handle (11) having one die (7a), a jaw part (3) having the other die (7b) movably connected therewith, a second handle (12) movably connected with the jaw part (3), and an intermediate link member (5) movably connected with the handles (11 and 12), first gripping portions (13a and 13b) disposed adjacent to the each of the connecting shafts (5a and 5b) of the intermediate link member (5) and griped by one hand of a worker, and second gripping portions (14a and 14b) disposed at a position more separated therefrom and griped by the other hand of a worker are provided, and the handles (11 and 12) at the second gripping portions (14a and 14b) are bent in the same direction on the plane of movement with respect to the handles (11 and 12), respectively, at the first gripping portions (13a and 13b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/00; B25B 27/14; B25G 1/10; H01R 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2006.01); B21D 39/00 (2006.01); B25B 7/00 (2006.01); B25B 7/12 (2006.01); B25B 25/00 (2006.01); B25B 27/14 (2006.01); B25G 1/00 (2006.01); B25G 1/10 (2006.01); H01R 43/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/146 (2013.01); B25B 7/00 (2013.01); B25G 1/102 (2013.01); H01R 43/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988934 A2 20000329; EP 0988934 A3 20060111; CA 2280686 A1 20000224; JP 2000061859 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2006-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-01-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-01-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: B25B 7/00 19680901AFI19991111BHEP

2006-01-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: B25B 27/14 19680901ALI20051123BHEP

2006-01-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: B25G 1/10 19680901ALI20051123BHEP

2006-01-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01R 43/04 19680901ALI20051123BHEP

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI