Global patent index - EP 0988944 A2

EP 0988944 A2 2000-03-29 - Punch

Title (en)

Punch

Title (de)

Locher

Title (fr)

Perforateur

Publication

EP 0988944 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118858 A

Priority

DE 29817330 U

Abstract (en)

The basic body has a lever arm (2) positioned by means of a swivel link (1) and a base plate (3) above which is an insertion compartment (4) for the sheets (6). The compartment has two spaced apart punch pins (5) connected to the lever arm. The base plate and or lever arm have a plate-shaped attachment (7a,7b) on the end side of the lever arm or base plate pointing away from the link. The end side grips round part of the lever arm's surface. The attachment and base plate are shaped to resemble a set of false teeth (13).

Abstract (de)

Handhabarer Locher für Folien, insbesondere aus Papier, mit einem Grundkörper, der einen über ein Schwenkgelenk angebrachten Hebelarm, eine Bodenplatte und ein oberhalb oder direkt auf der Bodenplatte angeordnetes Einschubfach für Folien aufweist, dem zwei voneinander beabstandete Stanzstifte zugeordnet sind, die mit dem Hebelarm in Verbindung stehen und bei Herabdrücken des Hebelarmes die Folien perforieren, wobei Bodenplatte und/oder Hebelarm im wesentlichen eine Ebene bestimmen und mit einem Aufsteckkörper versehen sind, wobei der Aufsteckkörper (7a bzw. 7b) im wesentlichen plattenförmig ausgebildet ist und derart an der vom Gelenk wegweisenden Stirnseite (9) des Hebelarmes (2) bzw. der Bodenplatte (3) angeordnet ist, daß er im wesentlichen in die Ebene des Hebelarmes (2) bzw. der Bodenplatte (3) ausgerichtet ist, sowie die Stirnseite (9), an der er angebracht ist und einen Teil der Oberfläche (14) des Hebelarms (2) bzw. der Bodenplatte (3) umgreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817330 U1 19990218; EP 0988944 A2 20000329; EP 0988944 A3 20020626

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI