Global Patent Index - EP 0988946 A2

EP 0988946 A2 2000-03-29 - Method and device for chipping wood

Title (en)

Method and device for chipping wood

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zerspanen von Holz

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour déchiqueter le bois

Publication

EP 0988946 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118511 A

Priority

DE 19843612 A

Abstract (en)

The method and appliance for machining wood incorporate a ring (2) fitted with cutting blades (5) on its inner periphery and parallel with its rotational axis (3). The wooden trunks (1) are held at one end by a holder and insertion system and are inserted into the ring by means of the opposite, free end. A forward thrust mechanism consists of a swivel part swiveling on a circular track (11) and on which the rotary bladed ring is positioned. The swivel axis (13) belonging to the part, and the rotational axis of the bladed ring are parallel. The wood trunks are held between two circle-arc shaped side walls (6,7).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Zerspanen von Holzstämmen (1) zu großflächigen Holzspänen, bei dem ein rotierender, mit parallel zu seiner Rotationsachse (3) ausgerichteten Schneidmessern (5) versehener Messerring (2) einerseits und eine Anzahl ebenfalls parallel zur Rotationsachse (3) des Messerringes (2) ausgerichteter Holzstämme (1) andererseits aufeinander zu bewegt und dabei die Holzstämme (1) zerspant werden. Die Erfindung bezieht sich außerdem auf eine Vorrichtung zum Ausführen dieses Verfahrens. Bei einer Vorrichtung der vorgenannten Art ist vorgesehen, daß die auf die Holzstämme (1) gerichtete Bewegung des Messerringes (2) und/oder die auf den Messerring (2) gerichtete Bewegung der Holzstämme (1) zumindest während des Zerspanungsvorganges auf einer gekrümmten Bahn erfolgt. Damit wird erreicht, daß einzelne Spansektoren <IMAGE>gestaucht", andere hingegen gedehnt" werden, woraus sich ein größerer Anteil von Spänen mit innerhalb der vorgegebenen Toleranz liegender Qualität ergibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01); B27L 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/02 (2013.01); B27L 11/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988946 A2 20000329; EP 0988946 A3 20000426; EP 0988946 B1 20031210; DE 19843612 A1 20000406; DE 19843612 C2 20001214; US 6390161 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FREITAG JOACHIM

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040918

2004-06-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908005 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB LU

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI