Global Patent Index - EP 0988949 A1

EP 0988949 A1 2000-03-29 - Plant for selectively making and distributing loads of mortar and/or concrete ready for use

Title (en)

Plant for selectively making and distributing loads of mortar and/or concrete ready for use

Title (de)

Anlage zum selektiven Herstellen und Verteilen von Ladungen aus Fertigmörtel und/oder Fertigbeton

Title (fr)

Installation pour la fabrication et la distribution sélective de charges de mortier et/ou de béton prêt a l'emploi

Publication

EP 0988949 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420192 A

Priority

FR 9811835 A

Abstract (en)

The plant, operated by a card control system, consists of a central frame with dispensers (R1, R2) for gravel, sand and cement from three separate storage zones (Z2, Z3, Z4), and a mixer (M) with an output system which sends the mixed materials to different zones (T1, T2, T3) for bulk loading, packaging in sacks or supple 'big bag' containers. A water tank adjacent to the mixer supplies water to it as required.

Abstract (fr)

L'installation pour la fabrication et la distribution sélective de charges de mortier et/ou de béton prêt à l'emploi est remarquable en ce qu'elle comprend dans sa partie centrale, une structure formant bâti (Bt) à partir de laquelle sont positionnés de haut en bas, des moyens (R1, R2, V) distributeurs de matériaux en provenance de trois zones de prélèvement (Z2, Z3, Z4), de gravier, de sable, de ciment, un mélangeur des différents matériaux, ledit mélangeur (M) étant agencé avec des sorties pour permettre la distribution des produits mélangés vers trois zones différentes de conditionnement (T1, T2, T3), en vrac, en sacs ou en conteneurs souples, sous-jacent au mélangeur et à l'aplomb, étant disposé un réservoir d'eau (R) qui est susceptible de permettre par des moyens appropriés une distribution d'eau dans le mélangeur (M) en vue de l'obtention des produits à distribuer, et des moyens permettant le recyclage de l'eau en cycle continu, ledit bâti étant agencé en outre pour recevoir des moyens permettant la distribution des produits mélangés vers les différents types de conditionnement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 9/00; B28C 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/16 (2006.01); B28C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/16 (2013.01); B28C 7/167 (2013.01); B28C 7/168 (2013.01); B28C 9/00 (2013.01); B28C 9/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9822271 A1 19980528 - R E C S A R L [FR], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988949 A1 20000329; EP 0988949 B1 20021106; AT 227200 T 20021115; DE 69903781 D1 20021212; DE 69903781 T2 20030814; ES 2187130 T3 20030516; FR 2783454 A1 20000324; FR 2783454 B1 20001208; PT 988949 E 20030331

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100913

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903781

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100913

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100913

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090911

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090904

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *REC S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20050930

2007-06-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-03-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070313

2007-03-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070313

2006-09-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-09-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-16 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041014

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040816

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187130 T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903781 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227200 T 20021115

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI