Global patent index - EP 0988959 A2

EP 0988959 A2 2000-03-29 - Powder compaction method

Title (en)

Powder compaction method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verdichten von Pulver

Title (fr)

Procédé de compactage de poudre

Publication

EP 0988959 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118060 A

Priority

JP 26927398 A

Abstract (en)

A powder compaction method in which a powder p is filled by air tapping or other suitable method into a mold 1, then while the mold 1 being filled with the powder, the powder particles are bound with each other without application of force from outside the mold to form a compact C, and then the compact C is taken out from the mold 1. This method produces a variety of shapes of the compact far greater than in conventional methods, and net shape manufacturing of products with complex shapes is made possible by this method. Because this method uses far less binder compared to MIM and PIM that are expected as methods for producing products with complicated shapes, the time needed for elimination of the binder is much shorter than in MIM and PIM. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 67/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/04 (2006.01); B22F 3/02 (2006.01); B22F 3/04 (2006.01); B28B 1/00 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B30B 11/00 (2006.01); B30B 15/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/00 (2013.01); B30B 15/302 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988959 A2 20000329; EP 0988959 A3 20020327; JP 2000096104 A 20000404; JP 3992376 B2 20071017

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 29C 67/02 A, 7B 29C 39/24 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI