Global Patent Index - EP 0988963 A2

EP 0988963 A2 2000-03-29 - Method of continuously shaping boxes from flat blanks

Title (en)

Method of continuously shaping boxes from flat blanks

Title (de)

Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Formgeben von flachen Zuschnitten für Schachteln

Title (fr)

Procédé de façonnage en continu de caisses à partir de flans plats

Publication

EP 0988963 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118564 A

Priority

DE 19843490 A

Abstract (en)

The carton blanks are surrendered from a stack one by one and are moved by a conveyer system(5). As the carton blank(2) advances, it is accompanied underneath by a form and on top by a press, which advance at the same speed. The form and press are operated in concert to fold the carton blank, before returning to the in-feed point for the next carton. An Independent claim is included for an assembly(1) to carry out the above process.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung 1 zum kontinuierlichen Formgeben von flachliegenden Zuschnitten 2 zu vollständig und/oder halbfertig geformten Schachteln 3 oder ähnlichen dreidimensional ausgebildeten Verpackungskörpern, wobei die Zuschnitte 2 mittels eines Transportsystems 5 einzeln transportiert werden, und parallel zu der Transportrichtung des Transportsystems 5 mindestens ein Formstempel 7 und mindestens ein Formgegenwerkzeug 8 verfahren werden, wobei der Formstempel 7 und/oder das Formgegenwerkzeug 8 dabei eine der Verfahrbewegung überlagerte Bewegung mit einer zur Transportrichtung senkrecht gerichteten Bewegungskomponente ausführt, und wobei alle mit den Zuschnitten 2 während der Formgebung in Berührung kommenden Elemente 7, 8, 8a, 8b, 28 über den gesamten Weg der Formgebung mit der gleichen Geschwindigkeit in der Transportrichtung bewegt werden wie die Zuschnitte 2. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/44; B31B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 3/44 (2006.01); B31B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 50/00 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843490 A1 20000323; EP 0988963 A2 20000329; EP 0988963 A3 20000510; US 6467241 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111107

2005-11-23 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20050901

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOR-REG AS

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 1/44 A, 7B 31B 1/04 B, 7B 31B 17/44 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI