Global patent index - EP 0988963 A3

EP 0988963 A3 2000-05-10 - Method of continuously shaping boxes from flat blanks

Title (en)

Method of continuously shaping boxes from flat blanks

Title (de)

Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Formgeben von flachen Zuschnitten in Schachteln

Title (fr)

Procédé de façonnage en continu de caisses à partir de flans plats

Publication

EP 0988963 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118564 A

Priority

DE 19843490 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0988963A2] The carton blanks are surrendered from a stack one by one and are moved by a conveyer system(5). As the carton blank(2) advances, it is accompanied underneath by a form and on top by a press, which advance at the same speed. The form and press are operated in concert to fold the carton blank, before returning to the in-feed point for the next carton. An Independent claim is included for an assembly(1) to carry out the above process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/44; B31B 1/04; B31B 17/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 3/44 (2006.01); B31B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843490 A1 20000323; EP 0988963 A2 20000329; EP 0988963 A3 20000510; US 6467241 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status

2011-12-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20111107

2005-11-23 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20050901

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOR-REG AS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 31B 1/44 A, 7B 31B 1/04 B, 7B 31B 17/44 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI