Global Patent Index - EP 0988971 A1

EP 0988971 A1 2000-03-29 - Method and device for developing cylindrical surfaces

Title (en)

Method and device for developing cylindrical surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Entwickeln von zylindrischen Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour traiter des surfaces cylindriques

Publication

EP 0988971 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118417 A

Priority

DE 19843369 A

Abstract (en)

An integrated illustrating device (2) inscribes active surfaces (3) on a printing forme cylinder (1). Particles given off during the inscription or illustration process are removed from these surfaces by cleaning elements (6) attached to the cylinder surface without applying cleaning fluid and drawn off by a suction device. The cylinder surface is cleaned spotlessly with a cleaning fluid and a textile cleaning element (20), triggering the active surfaces.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zum Entwickeln zylindrischer Oberflächen in Druckmaschinen mit mindestens einer integrierten Bebilderungseinrichtung zum Beschreiben/Bebildern von Wirkflächen eines Druckformzylinders. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zum Entwickeln direkt beschriebener/bebilderter Wirkflächen zu schaffen, die für sämtliche Druckvorlagen bei allen im Offset üblichen Auflösungen und Rasterweiten einsetzbar sind. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe durch ein Verfahren zum Entwickeln zylindrischer Oberflächen in Druckmaschinen mit mindestens einer integrierten Bebilderungseinrichtung (2) zum Beschreiben/Bebildern von Wirkflächen (3) eines Druckformzylinders (1), bei dem die beim Beschreiben/Bebildern entstehenden Partikel ohne Zuführung eines Reinigungsfluids durch an die Oberfläche des Druckformzylinders (1) anstellbare Reinigungselemente (6) von den Wirkflächen (3) des Druckformzylinders (1) abgetragen und von einer Absaugeinrichtung abgeführt werden, nachfolgend werden durch ein eine textile Fläche (20) aufweisendes Reinigungselement (18) bei Anwesenheit eines Reinigungsfluid die Oberfläche des Druckformzylinders (1) feingereinigt und die Wirkflächen (3) aktiviert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/02 (2013.01); B41P 2227/70 (2013.01); B41P 2235/23 (2013.01); B41P 2235/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843369 A1 20000323; EP 0988971 A1 20000329; EP 0988971 B1 20020605

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100917

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901601

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100917

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901601 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI