Global Patent Index - EP 0988995 A2

EP 0988995 A2 2000-03-29 - Document folder

Title (en)

Document folder

Title (de)

Ordner

Title (fr)

Classeur

Publication

EP 0988995 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98204036 A

Priority

  • JP 26557698 A
  • JP 30152598 A

Abstract (en)

A document folder 1 for holding a document 7 is provided, which comprises a document holding portion 4 having a rectangular shape in plan, a reinforcement portion 5 provided adjacent the document holding portion 4 along one edge of the document holding portion 4 and reinforced by a multiplicity of fusion-bonded spots formed therein, and binder engagement means including a plurality of engagement portions 6 formed in the reinforcement portion 5 in a properly spaced relation along the one edge of the document holding portion 4 for engagement with a document binder, the document holding portion 4 and the reinforcement portion 5 being integrally composed of a synthetic resin sheet 2, 3, the document holding portion 4 having an opening 8 formed along at least one of the other three edges of the document holding portion 4 through which opening the document 7 is inserted into and taken out of the document holding portion 4. The present invention ensures easy reinforcement of the portion formed with the binder engagement means for cost reduction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/00 (2006.01); B42F 7/02 (2006.01); B42F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0988995 A2 20000329; EP 0988995 A3 20001129; EP 0988995 B1 20031022; DE 69819152 D1 20031127; DK 0988995 T3 20031201; JP 2000158865 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-11-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-09-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-02-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-01-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-12-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69819152 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 42F 7/02 A, 7B 42F 11/02 B, 7B 42F 3/00 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI