Global patent index - EP 0989041 A2

EP 0989041 A2 2000-03-29 - Device for applying a spring tension to a cable grip

Title (en)

Device for applying a spring tension to a cable grip

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Aufbringung einer Federspannung auf eine Seilklemme

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer une tension de ressort à une pince de câble

Publication

EP 0989041 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890117 A

Priority

AT 161398 A

Abstract (en)

The device includes a cup-form housing (21) accommodating disc springs (22), and from which protrudes a stepped pipe connection (23). The wall thickness of the section of the pipe connection provided with a second external thread (27) is at least 1.2 times the wall thickness of the section with the first external thread (26) screwed into the clamping component (11). The length of the section with the second external thread is equal approximately to 0.5 to 0.8 times the length of the section with the first external thread.

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung zur Aufbringung einer Federspannung auf einen mit einer starren Klemmbacke (12) und mit einer beweglichen Klemmbacke (13) ausgebildeten Klemmkörper (11) zur Ankupplung eines Gehänges (20) an ein Zug- bzw. Förderseil (10), bestehend aus einem topfartigen Gehäuse (21), in welchem Federelemente, insbesondere Tellerfedern (22), angeordnet sind und mit einem von diesem Gehäuse (21) abragenden Rohrstutzen (23), welcher mit einem ersten Außengewinde (26) in eine mit einem Innengewinde (16) ausgebildete Bohrung (14) des Klemmkörpers (11) einschraubbar ist und welches zwischen dem Gehäuse (21) und dem ersten Außengewinde (26) mit einem zweiten Außengewinde (27) ausgebildet ist, auf welchem eine Gegenmutter (28) verschraubbar ist. Dabei weist die Wandstärke des mit dem zweiten Außengewinde (27) versehenen Abschnittes des Rohrstutzens (23) mindestens den 1.2-fachen Betrag der Wandstärke des in den Klemmkörper (11) einschraubbaren Abschnittes des Rohrstutzens (23) mit dem ersten Außengewinde (26) auf (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/122 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989041 A2 20000329; EP 0989041 A3 20001108; EP 0989041 B1 20031015; AT 408539 B 20011227; AT A161398 A 20010515; DE 59907358 D1 20031120; NO 320198 B1 20051114; NO 992285 A 20000330; NO 992285 D0 19990511

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040716

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LEMAN CONSULTING S.A.

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020829

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI