Global Patent Index - EP 0989041 A3

EP 0989041 A3 2000-11-08 - Device for applying a spring tension to a cable grip

Title (en)

Device for applying a spring tension to a cable grip

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Aufbringung einer Federspannung auf eine Seilklemme

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer une tension de ressort à une pince de câble

Publication

EP 0989041 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890117 A

Priority

AT 161398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989041A2] The device includes a cup-form housing (21) accommodating disc springs (22), and from which protrudes a stepped pipe connection (23). The wall thickness of the section of the pipe connection provided with a second external thread (27) is at least 1.2 times the wall thickness of the section with the first external thread (26) screwed into the clamping component (11). The length of the section with the second external thread is equal approximately to 0.5 to 0.8 times the length of the section with the first external thread.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989041 A2 20000329; EP 0989041 A3 20001108; EP 0989041 B1 20031015; AT 408539 B 20011227; AT A161398 A 20010515; DE 59907358 D1 20031120; NO 320198 B1 20051114; NO 992285 A 20000330; NO 992285 D0 19990511

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907358 P 20031120

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LEMAN CONSULTING S.A.

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020829

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI