Global Patent Index - EP 0989062 A1

EP 0989062 A1 2000-03-29 - Device for filling a pressurized pharmaceutical liquid in a package

Title (en)

Device for filling a pressurized pharmaceutical liquid in a package

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abfüllen einer unter Druck stehenden pharmazeutischen Flüssigkeit in Verpackungsbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour remplir un liquide pharmaceutique sous pression dans un récipient

Publication

EP 0989062 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116465 A

Priority

DE 19844011 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19844011C1] Pressurized pharmaceutical liquid (1) filling apparatus comprises a primary pipe (13) which enables the liquid to be taken from a container to a distribution unit, filling valves (18) and pipes, and a pressure sensor for the liquid. The temperature in the distributor is held constant and the distribution unit is surrounded by a housing with an inner coolant channel.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung (10) zum Abfüllen einer pharmazeutischen Flüssigkeit (1) in Vials (2) hat einen Produktbehälter (11), der über eine Zuführleitung (13) mit einem Verteiler (15) verbunden ist. Von dem Verteiler (15) zweigen Fülleitungen (17) mit Abfüllventilen (18) für die einzelnen Vials (2) ab. Um die Abfüllgenauigkeit insbesondere bei Flüssigkeiten (1), die ein stark temperaturabhängiges Fließverhalten aufweisen zu verbessern, wird vorgeschlagen, zumindest den Verteiler (15) durch ein Kühlmittel derart zu kühlen, daß die Flüssigkeit (1) während der Füllvorgänge eine konstante Temperatur aufweist, die der Berechnung der Ansteuerzeit der Füllventile (18) von einer Steuereinrichtung (20) zugrundegelegt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 63/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/04 (2006.01); B65B 63/08 (2006.01); B67C 3/02 (2006.01); B67D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 63/08 (2013.01); B67D 1/0867 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4341934 A1 19950614 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19844011 C1 20000309; EP 0989062 A1 20000329; EP 0989062 B1 20030312; JP 2000109190 A 20000418; US 6176277 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59904519

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130821

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-06-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904519

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020627

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI