Global Patent Index - EP 0989064 A1

EP 0989064 A1 2000-03-29 - Bag

Title (en)

Bag

Title (de)

Sack

Title (fr)

Sac

Publication

EP 0989064 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117301 A

Priority

DE 19840792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840792A1] The sack (50) comprises a base, two broad sack walls (41), two narrower walls (42) folded onto themselves and a sack opening with a closure (48) comprising two first flaps (21) connected to the broad walls and two second flaps (22) folded centrally onto themselves connected to the narrower walls. The faces of gussets (23,24) at the ends of both first and second flaps lie against each other to form double layer sealing corners (47) which are bonded or welded together. Independent claims are made for: a) a process for producing a paper sack in which an adhesively coated transverse edge (15) of the paper sheet is folded over parallel to the latter edge and overlapped with the opposing edge to form a sack open at both ends, four gusset shaped adhesive applications are made on a longitudinal edge (18) at the sack closure (48) which when the closure flaps (21,22) are folded over onto each other bonds the gussets (23,24) together and forms sealing corners (47); b) a plastic film sack manufacturing process in which a sack open at both ends is produced, four gusset shaped overlaps are created along a longitudinal edge between the sack body and the closure and gusset faces bordered by the edge are welded together to form double layer sealing corners. Preferred Features: A boundary line of the first gusset (23) is formed by the connecting edge (18) of each first flap (21) and each corresponding boundary edge of the second gusset (24) runs at a right angle to the free long edge of each second closure flap. After folding the sack closure the corresponding boundary edges run parallel to the sack opening. The flaps and gussets are bordered either by a common folding edge (25) at 45 deg to the connecting edge or by cut edges starting from the connecting edges.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Sack (51) mit einem aus vier Sackwandungen gebildeten Sackkorpus (50), an dem zwei erste breitere Sackwandungen (41) deckungsgleich aufeinanderliegen und zwei zweite schmalere Sackwandungen (42) jeweils in Richtung ihrer Längskanten mittig auf sich selbst gefaltet sind, und der an einem Ende des Sackkorpus von einem Sackboden (49) verschlossen ist und der am anderen Ende des Sackkorpus (50) eine Sacköffnung (55) bildet, sowie mit einem an der Sacköffnung (55) an den Sackkorpus (50) anschließenden unverschlossenen Sackverschluß (48), wobei der Sackverschluß (48) zwei an die ersten Sackwandungen (41) anschließende aufeinanderliegende erste Verschlußlappen (21) und zwei an die zweiten Sackwandungen (42) anschliessende, jeweils in Richtung der Faltung der zweiten Sackwandungen (42) mittig auf sich selbst gefaltete zweite Verschlußlappen (22) umfaßt, wobei jeweils an den Enden der ersten Verschlußlappen (21) erste Zwickel (23) und an den Enden der zweiten Verschlußlappen (22) zweite Zwickel (24) vorgesehen sind, und jeweils unmittelbar benachbarte erste und zweite Zwickel (23,24) mit ihren Innenflachen aufeinanderliegen und miteinander unter Bildung von doppellagigen Abdichtecken (47) miteinander verklebt oder verschweißt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 30/12; B31B 29/00; B65B 5/02; B65B 43/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 29/00 (2006.01); B65D 30/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 31/08 (2013.01); B31B 2150/00 (2017.08); B31B 2150/0014 (2017.08); B31B 2160/20 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840792 A1 20000309; DE 19840792 C2 20030424; EP 0989064 A1 20000329; PL 335296 A1 20000313; US 2003103693 A1 20030605; US 2003104913 A1 20030605; US 2003104914 A1 20030605; US 6533457 B1 20030318

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI