Global Patent Index - EP 0989066 A1

EP 0989066 A1 2000-03-29 - Threaded cap having a threading resistance

Title (en)

Threaded cap having a threading resistance

Title (de)

Verschluss mit einer selbstbremsende Gewinde

Title (fr)

Elément de bouchage à vissage freiné

Publication

EP 0989066 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402196 A

Priority

FR 9811944 A

Abstract (en)

Lid comprises outer cover and inner ring (12) with internal thread components (11) to engage the threads on the container neck. Elastically deformable elements (28, 31) in the form of diametrically opposite flat sections hold the lid in place on the container when the threads are engaged. Both the thread components and deformable elements are located on a lateral skirt (15) of the lid ring.

Abstract (fr)

La présente demande concerne un élément de bouchage comportant un premier filetage (11) apte à coopérer avec un second filetage, formé par un récipient destiné à recevoir ledit élément de bouchage. Selon l'invention, l'élément de bouchage comprend des moyens élastiquement déformables (28, 31) aptes, en position d'engagement desdits premier (11) et second filetages, à maintenir en appui élastique ledit élément de bouchage sur ledit récipient selon au moins une direction orientée radialement par rapport audit élément de bouchage, de manière à améliorer la tenue et le fonctionnement de l'élément de bouchage sur le récipient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2006.01); B65D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/0471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989066 A1 20000329; CN 1086669 C 20020626; CN 1250013 A 20000412; FR 2783806 A1 20000331; FR 2783806 B1 20001103; JP 2000095255 A 20000404; JP 3199708 B2 20010820; US 2002033375 A1 20020321; US 6520361 B2 20030218

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020618

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI