Global patent index - EP 0989069 A2

EP 0989069 A2 2000-03-29 - Self-standing pouch made of sealable material

Title (en)

Self-standing pouch made of sealable material

Title (de)

Standbodenbeutel aus schweissbarem Material

Title (fr)

Sachet tenant debout en matériau soudable

Publication

EP 0989069 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118223 A

Priority

DE 29817142 U

Abstract (en)

The packaging has two walls which are joined together at their edges, a top and a base. The edges (11,12) of the base fold (8) run parallel to one another and to the central aixs (16) of the packaging while the edge seams (5,6) of the side walls (4) converge from the base to the top. Two partition ridges (17) are made form the wall material of the walls and converge from the corners of the top in the direction of the base.

Abstract (de)

Ein Standbodenbeutel (1) aus schweißbarem Material hat zwei an ihren Seitenrändern (5,6) durch je eine Schweißnaht (7) miteinander verbundene Beutelwände (4), ein Kopfende (3) und ein Bodenende (2), das von einer Bodenfalte (8) gebildet ist, die sich im Leerzustand des Beutels (1) zwischen die beiden Beutelwände (4) erstreckt und an ihren unteren und seitlichen Rändern (10,11,12) ihrerseits durch Schweißnähte (13,14) mit der jeweils angrenzenden Beutelwand (4) verbunden ist. Die seitlichen Schweißnahtränder (11,12) der Bodenfalte (8) verlaufen parallel zueinander und zu einer mittleren Hochachse (16) des Beutels (1), während die seitlichen Schweißnahtränder (5,6) der Beutelwände (4) einen von einem an die Bodenfalte (8) angrenzenden Bereich zum Kopfende (3) konvergierenden schrägen Verlauf aufweisen. In jeder Beutelwand (4) sind zumindest zwei Teilerrippen (17) aus dem Wandmaterial ausgeprägt, die von den beiden Eckbereichen zwischen dem Kopfende (3) und der jeweils angrenzenden seitlichen Schweißnaht (7) ausgehen, einen zur Bodenfalte (8) hin konvergierenden schrägen Verlauf aufweisen und in einer den Übergangabereich zwischen den parallelen und schrägen Schweißnahträndern (11,12;5,6) enthaltenden Querebene des Beutels (1) frei enden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989069 A2 20000329; EP 0989069 A3 20000823; EP 0989069 B1 20021113; DE 29817142 U1 20000302

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BISCHOF+KLEIN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903381

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020422

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BISCHOF+KLEIN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI