Global Patent Index - EP 0989069 A3

EP 0989069 A3 2000-08-23 - Self-standing pouch made of sealable material

Title (en)

Self-standing pouch made of sealable material

Title (de)

Standbodenbeutel aus schweissbarem Material

Title (fr)

Sachet tenant debout en matériau soudable

Publication

EP 0989069 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118223 A

Priority

DE 29817142 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989069A2] The packaging has two walls which are joined together at their edges, a top and a base. The edges (11,12) of the base fold (8) run parallel to one another and to the central aixs (16) of the packaging while the edge seams (5,6) of the side walls (4) converge from the base to the top. Two partition ridges (17) are made form the wall material of the walls and converge from the corners of the top in the direction of the base.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989069 A2 20000329; EP 0989069 A3 20000823; EP 0989069 B1 20021113; DE 29817142 U1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BISCHOF+KLEIN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: BISCHOF+KLEIN GMBH & CO. KG#RAHESTRASSE 47#49525 LENGERICH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BISCHOF+KLEIN GMBH & CO. KG#RAHESTRASSE 47#49525 LENGERICH (DE)

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903381 20021219

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020422

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BISCHOF+KLEIN GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI