Global Patent Index - EP 0989075 A1

EP 0989075 A1 2000-03-29 - Loading and charging device for refuse transport container

Title (en)

Loading and charging device for refuse transport container

Title (de)

Lade-und Beschickungsvorrichtung für Abfalltransportbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'introduction et de chargement pour récipient de transport de déchets

Publication

EP 0989075 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107718 A

Priority

DE 29817069 U

Abstract (en)

The refuse collection vehicle has a chassis-mounted container with a loading hatch with an essentially cylindrical housing (5) into which refuse is deposited. The housing then rotates about an axis (4) while a refuse compression shield rotates about the same axis, pushing the refuse into the container.

Abstract (de)

Mit einer Vorrichtung (1) zum Laden- und Beschicken von Abfällen in einen Abfalltransportbehälter (2) mit einer Einfüllöffnung (14), insbesondere auf Fahrzeugen, soll eine Lösung geschaffen werden, bei der der Müll, auch feuchter Biomüll, unter gleichzeitiger Verdichtung von oben in einen Container eingefüllt werden kann, ohne daß Flüssigkeit aus dem Container ausläuft, und ohne daß der Müll innerhalb des Containers nach oben gepreßt werden muß. Dies wird durch ein von der Ladeposition in die Behälterbeschickungsposition um eine Achse (4) verschwenkbares im wesentlichen zylindrisches Gehäuse (5) erreicht sowie durch eine um die gleiche Achse (4) verschwenkbare Vorschub- und Verdichterwand (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/20 (2006.01); B65F 3/00 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/205 (2013.01); B65F 2003/008 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0279 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0163859 B1 19891129

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817069 U1 19990304; EP 0989075 A1 20000329; EP 0989075 B1 20020911; ES 2179571 T3 20030116; HU 9901825 A1 20000428; HU 9901825 D0 19990830; PL 335276 A1 20000327; SK 118499 A3 20000612

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040419

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179571 T3

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902635 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI