Global Patent Index - EP 0989075 B1

EP 0989075 B1 2002-09-11 - Loading and charging device for refuse transport container

Title (en)

Loading and charging device for refuse transport container

Title (de)

Lade-und Beschickungsvorrichtung für Abfalltransportbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'introduction et de chargement pour récipient de transport de déchets

Publication

EP 0989075 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107718 A

Priority

DE 29817069 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989075A1] The refuse collection vehicle has a chassis-mounted container with a loading hatch with an essentially cylindrical housing (5) into which refuse is deposited. The housing then rotates about an axis (4) while a refuse compression shield rotates about the same axis, pushing the refuse into the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/20 (2006.01); B65F 3/00 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/205 (2013.01); B65F 2003/008 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0279 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817069 U1 19990304; EP 0989075 A1 20000329; EP 0989075 B1 20020911; ES 2179571 T3 20030116; HU 9901825 A1 20000428; HU 9901825 D0 19990830; PL 335276 A1 20000327; SK 118499 A3 20000612

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040419

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179571 T3

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902635 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI