Global Patent Index - EP 0989083 A2

EP 0989083 A2 2000-03-29 - Device for feeding folded sheets for gathering machine

Title (en)

Device for feeding folded sheets for gathering machine

Title (de)

Falzbogenanleger für Sammelhefter

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation de feuilles pliées pour assembleuse

Publication

EP 0989083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111942 A

Priority

DE 19841265 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet feeder has at least one decollator drum (16) for the folded sheets (10) which conveys them up to a register fence (20) pivoted along the periphery of the drum. A first optical sensor (46) monitors the format width (Bb) of the folded sheets. This is coupled to a control unit for adjusting the position of the fence.

Abstract (de)

Ein Falzbogenanleger für Sammelhefter weist wenigstens eine Vereinzelungstrommel (16), einen Registeranschlag (20), der im Bereich des Umfangs der Vereinzelungstrommel (16) angeordnet und für den Anschlag von Falzbogen (12) vorgesehen ist, die durch die Vereinzelungstrommel (16) befördert werden, und Mittel (38, 40, 42, 44) zum Verschwenken des Registeranschlags (20) entlang des Umfangs der Vereinzelungstrommel (16) auf. Um die Einstellung der Registeranschläge (20) zu vereinfachen, sind weiterhin ein erster Sensor (46) zur Erfassung der Formatbreite der Falzbogen (12), eine zur Signalübertragung mit dem ersten Sensor (46) gekoppelte Steuereinheit (50) und eine zur Signalübertragung mit der Steuereinheit (50) gekoppelte Antriebseinheit (22) für die Mittel (38, 40, 42, 44) zum Verschwenken des Registeranschlags vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/30; B65H 5/12; B65H 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/30 (2006.01); B65H 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/307 (2013.01); B65H 9/04 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4531 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841265 A1 20000316; EP 0989083 A2 20000329; EP 0989083 A3 20000531; EP 0989083 B1 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905044

2014-12-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MUELLER MARTINI HOLDING AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG, 69115 HEIDELBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59905044

- Effective date: 20141023

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070623

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070623

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070623

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-07-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905044 P 20030522

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI