Global Patent Index - EP 0989085 A1

EP 0989085 A1 2000-03-29 - Label strip

Title (en)

Label strip

Title (de)

Etikettenstreifen

Title (fr)

Bande d'étiquettes

Publication

EP 0989085 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117992 A

Priority

EP 98117992 A

Abstract (en)

A repair element (20) is provided for the replacement of a part of the protective film of the label strip while maintaining the spacings prescribed for the strip. The repair element is located between the underlayer (10) and the protective film (12), or may be located on the side of the protective film facing away from the underlayer. The adhesive coating (11) of the label strip sticks to the upper surface of the repair element which has adhesive faces to which adheres the protective film of the label strip.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Etikettenstreifen mit einer Anzahl von Etiketten mit Perforationen und/oder Ausstanzungen (4) zwischen den einzelnen Etiketten (2), wobei der Etikettenstreifen (1) ein Substrat (10) mit einer Klebeschicht (11) und eine Schutzfolie (12) aufweist, ist ein Reparaturelement (20) zum Ersetzen eines Teils der Schutzfolie des Etikettenstreifens (1) unter Einhaltung der auf dem Streifen vorgegebenen Abstände vorgesehen. Ein solches Reparaturelement für einen Etikettenstreifen weist ein Substrat (21) auf, dessen eine Oberfläche (22) lösbar mit dem mit einer Klebeschicht (11) versehenen Substrat (10) des Etikettenstreifens (1) verbindbar ist, und wobei die Breite des Reparaturelementes im wesentlichen der Breite des Etiketts entspricht. Bei einem Verfahren zum Reparieren eines Etikettenstreifens mittels eines solchen Reparaturelementes wird ein erstes Etikettenstreifenende (13) benachbart zu einem zweiten Etikettenstreifenende (13) gelegt, werden Schutzschichten (12) der beiden Etikettenstreifenenden von den Klebeflächen der Substrate der beiden Etikettenstreifenenden abgehoben, wird das Reparaturelement mit seiner Beschichtungsseite (22) auf die Klebefläche (11) des Substrates (10) aufgefügt und werden die Schutzfolien auf die Rückseite des Reparaturelementes wieder aufgelegt und festgestrichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 21/00; B65H 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 21/02 (2013.01); B65H 21/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46014 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989085 A1 20000329; EP 0989085 B1 20031210; AT 256066 T 20031215; DE 59810409 D1 20040122

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070923

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070923

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070923

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070923

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070923

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *X-IDENT TECHNOLOGY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-10-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060908

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810409 P 20040122

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI LU

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: X-IDENT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: X-IDENT GMBH

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI LU

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI LU

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI