Global Patent Index - EP 0989088 A3

EP 0989088 A3 2000-08-09 - Bottling plant with rotor

Title (en)

Bottling plant with rotor

Title (de)

Gefässbehandlungsmaschine mit einem Rotor

Title (fr)

Machine de remplissage avec rotor

Publication

EP 0989088 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118850 A

Priority

DE 29817145 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989088A2] The bottles (16) are pressed against the filling members (2) by spring elements (8) which are switched in between the rotor (1) and the holders (9) for the locking devices (7) mounted on the rotor. The filling members have a high-strength seal for the bottle mouths and the rotor is formed as a kettle for the liquid being filled. The holders (9) can be mounted vertically movable on the rotor and are pretension in the upper end position by the spring elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 19610336 A1 19970925 - ORTMANN & HERBST MASCH GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817145 U1 19990429; EP 0989088 A2 20000329; EP 0989088 A3 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 67C 3/22 A, 7B 67C 3/24 B

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI