Global Patent Index - EP 0989174 A1

EP 0989174 A1 2000-03-29 - Adhesive composition

Title (en)

Adhesive composition

Title (de)

Klebemittel-Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition adhésive

Publication

EP 0989174 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99118697 A

Priority

JP 26885498 A

Abstract (en)

An adhesive sheet not tacky at ordinary temperatures, exhibiting strong adhesion and high heat resistance by heating under low pressure for a short period of time, having no problem of adhesive protrusion in heat adhesion, storable at ordinary temperatures and excellent in aging stability, which comprises a base material having provided on one side or both sides thereof a layer or layers of a thermal adhesive composition comprising a non-tacky polymer prepared from monomers composed of 70% to 100% by weight of a (meth)acrylic ester represented by the following general formula (I), a homopolymer of which has a glass transition temperature of -30 DEG C or more, and 0% to 30% by weight of a monoethylenic unsaturated monomer copolymerizable therewith, based on the total amount of the monomers: <CHEM> wherein R1 represents a hydrogen atom or a methyl group; R2 represents a methylene group, an ethylene group or a propylene group; n is an integer of 1 to 3; and phi represents a phenyl group, a monoalkyl-substituted phenyl group or a dialkyl-substituted phenyl group.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09J 133/14; C09J 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09J 133/08 (2006.01); C09J 7/02 (2006.01); C09J 123/06 (2006.01); C09J 133/14 (2006.01); C09J 171/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09J 133/14 (2013.01); C09J 7/35 (2018.01); C09J 2201/61 (2013.01); C09J 2433/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989174 A1 20000329; JP 2000096018 A 20000404; JP 4913930 B2 20120411; KR 20000023341 A 20000425; SG 82641 A1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI