Global patent index - EP 0989179 A1

EP 0989179 A1 2000-03-29 - Refrigerating machine oil

Title (en)

Refrigerating machine oil

Title (de)

Kältemaschinenöl

Title (fr)

Huile pour machine réfrigérante

Publication

EP 0989179 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99850137 A

Priority

JP 26642998 A

Abstract (en)

Refrigerating machine oils for use with a dimethyl ether refrigerant comprises a hydrocarbon oil. The refrigerating machine oil has an excellent lubricity, miscibility with a refrigerant, electric insulation, hydrolysis resistance and kinematic viscosity, all of which are well-balanced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 171/00; C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 101/02 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 171/008 (2013.01); C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 2203/06 (2013.01); C10M 2203/065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/10 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/102 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/028 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/04 (2013.01); C10M 2207/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/043 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 169/04 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 105/06 + C10M 107/10 + C10M 129/18 + C10M 137/04 + C10M 137/08

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989179 A1 20000329; JP 2000096071 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI