Global patent index - EP 0989195 A1

EP 0989195 A1 2000-03-29 - Heat resisting aluminium alloy of the type AlCuMg

Title (en)

Heat resisting aluminium alloy of the type AlCuMg

Title (de)

Warmfeste Aluminiumlegierung vom Typ AlCuMg

Title (fr)

Alliage à base d'alumium de type AlCuMg resistant à la chaleur

Publication

EP 0989195 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810967 A

Priority

EP 98810967 A

Abstract (en)

Aluminum alloy of the AlCuMg type contains alloying additions (in wt.%) of 4.5-5.5 Cu, 0.45-0.65 Mg, maximum 0.2 Si, maximum 0,25 Fe, maximum 0.8 Mn, maximum 0.15 Ti, and optionally 0.12-0.25 Zr, 0.05-0.5 Ag and maximum 0.15 impurities. An Independent claim is also included for the manufacture of a plate made of Al alloy comprising casting an ingot of the alloy, homogenizing the cast ingot, maintaining the ingot at 380-440 degrees C for at least 2.5 hours, hot rolling the ingot to a plate at 380-440 degrees C, solution annealing the plate, quenching, stretching the plate by 1-5%, and hardening the plate.

Abstract (de)

Eine Aluminiumlegierung vom Typ AlCuMg in geknetetem Zustand mit hoher mechanischer Festigkeit und hoher Wärmebeständigkeit weist im lösungsgeglühten, abgeschreckten, gestreckten und warmausgelagerten Zustand (T8) eine Fliessspannung bei Raumtemperatur von Rp0.2 > 450 MPa, nach einer Vorlagerung von 300 h bei 160°C eine Fliessspannung bei 160°C von Rp0.2 > 340 MPa und nach einer Kriechbelastung von 1000 h bei 160°C unter einer Zugspannung von 260 MPa eine Dehnung von weniger als 0.5% auf. Die Legierung enthält 4.5 bis 5.5 Gew.-% Kupfer, 0.45 bis 0.65 Gew.-% Magnesium, max. 0.2 Gew.-% Silizium, max. 0.25 Gew.-% Eisen, max. 0.8 Gew.-% Mangan, max. 0.15 Gew.-%Titan wahlweise noch, 0.12 bis 0.25 Gew.-% Zirkonium, 0.05 bis 0.5 Gew.-% Silber sowie Aluminium als Rest mit herstellungsbedingten Verunreinigungen einzeln max. 0.05 Gew.-%, insgesamt max. 0.15 Gew.-%. Die Legierung eignet sich insbesondere zur Herstellung von Kunststoffformen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/12; C22F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/16 (2006.01); C22F 1/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/057 (2013.01); C22C 21/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5630889 A 19970520 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
  • [X] US 5652063 A 19970729 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
  • [X] US 5800927 A 19980901 - KARABIN LYNETTE M [US]
  • [X] EP 0224016 A1 19870603 - BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]
  • [X] EP 0756017 A1 19970129 - PECHINEY RHENALU [FR]
  • [A] WO 9527091 A1 19951012 - REYNOLDS METALS CO [US]
  • [A] WO 9629440 A1 19960926 - KAISER ALUMINIUM CHEM CORP [US]
  • [A] ANYALEBECHI P N ET AL: "EFFECT OF SUPEREUTECTIC HOMOGENIZATION ON INCIDENCE OF POROSITY IN ALUMINUM ALLOY 2014 INGOT", METALLURGICAL AND MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS B: PROCESS METALLURGY & MATERIALS PROCESSING SCIENCE, vol. 25B, no. 1, 1 February 1994 (1994-02-01), pages 111 - 122, XP000425868
  • [A] M.J.HAYNES AND R.P.GANGLOFF: "ELEVATED TEMPERATURE FRACTURE TOUGHNESS OF Al-Cu-Mg-Ag SHEET: CHARACTERIZATION AND MODELING", METALLURGICAL AND MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS, vol. 28A, no. 9, pages 1815 - 1829, XP002087749

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989195 A1 20000329; EP 0989195 B1 20020424; AT 216737 T 20020515; DE 59803924 D1 20020529; ES 2175647 T3 20021116; PT 989195 E 20020830

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20071207

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-17 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20080409

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-09 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20071207

2008-04-09 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20071207

2008-04-09 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20071207

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: ALERIS ALUMINUM KOBLENZ GMBH

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: ALERIS ALUMINUM KOBLENZ GMBH

- Effective date: 20030122

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070904

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

2003-03-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPRODUKTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175647

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-08-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803924

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-29

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216737

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI