Global Patent Index - EP 0989197 A1

EP 0989197 A1 2000-03-29 - Method for surface treating the inner surface of hollow bodies

Title (en)

Method for surface treating the inner surface of hollow bodies

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Oberflächenbearbeitung der Innenseite von Hohlkörpern

Title (fr)

Méthode d'usinage de la surface interne de corps creux

Publication

EP 0989197 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114750 A

Priority

DE 19840117 A

Abstract (en)

The inner surface of the hollow body is machined in a single operation without lubricants by means of a tool with defined and/or non defined surface profile.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Oberflächenbearbeitung der Innenseite von Hohlkörpern, insbesondere von Zylinderbohrungen als Vorbereitung zum Aufbringen einer thermisch gespritzten Schicht, wobei ein Teil des die Innenseite bildenden Materials abgetragen und eine Oberfläche mit einer definierten Struktur und/oder Güte erzeugt wird. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß vor der thermischen Beschichtung die Innenseite in einem Verfahrensschritt ohne Schmierstoff bzw. mit Mangelschmierung trocken zerspant wird, wobei ein Werkzeug mit einem definierten und/oder undefinierten Oberflächenprofil verwendet wird. Dadurch erübrigt sich die aufwendige Entfettung der Oberfläche im Anschluß an die Bearbeitung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/02 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49272 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49995 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840117 A1 20000316; DE 19840117 C2 20010816; EP 0989197 A1 20000329; EP 0989197 B1 20020918; US 2005044707 A1 20050303; US 7089662 B2 20060815

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060728

2006-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060728

2005-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902726 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000219

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI