Global Patent Index - EP 0989213 A1

EP 0989213 A1 2000-03-29 - Carding machine respectively woolen carding machine

Title (en)

Carding machine respectively woolen carding machine

Title (de)

Karde bzw. Krempel

Title (fr)

Machine de cardage respectivement machine de cardage dite laine

Publication

EP 0989213 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810792 A

Priority

  • CH 181198 A
  • CH 193598 A

Abstract (en)

The carding machine has at least two licker-in units (102,104,106) in succession. The licker-in roller which works together with the drum (100) has a larger diameter than the preceding licker-in roller. With three licker-in units, the first two rollers have the same diameter The licker-in roller at the drum has a diameter of 240-280 mm, and the first two licker-in rollers have a diameter of 150-200 mm. The rotary axes (A1-A3) of the licker-in rollers are on a common horizontal plane (E), or the licker-in roller at the drum is at a higher level than the preceding licker-in rollers. With a card working width of 1000 mm, the drives for the working units are contained between the vertical sides. The drive transmission belts and cogwheels pass between the drives and the shrouding. The transmissions are divided over a number of drive planes. The carding machine has an entry and/or exit module, on a swing mounting to move between a working position at the drum and a position clear of the drum. The machine has at least one roller module, with the module guide incorporated into the card, for the module to move in and out of the ready position to take up the working position. The drum has a diameter of 700-1000 mm, across its working width. The fiber feed to the carding machine is a shaft with a fiber cleaning system. The lower carding zone forms an enclosed angle at the rotary axis of 90 degrees and preferably 80 degrees . The ratio of the drum diameter to the diameter of the doffer is preferably 1.5.

Abstract (de)

Eine Karde bzw. ein Krempel weist mehrere, vorzugsweise drei Vorreisser (102, 104, 106) auf. Der Durchmesser des mit der Trommel (100) zusammenarbeitenden Vorreissers (106) ist grösser als der Durchmesser des vorangehenden Vorreissers (104).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/20 (2006.01); D01G 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/20 (2013.01); D01G 31/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989213 A1 20000329; EP 0989213 B1 20030129; EP 0989213 B2 20060329; DE 59904142 D1 20030306

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904142

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904142

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-03-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-07-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904142 P 20030306

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI