Global patent index - EP 0989214 A1

EP 0989214 A1 2000-03-29 - Method and apparatus for removing foreign substances from fiber material, especially from raw cotton

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for removing foreign substances from fiber material, especially from raw cotton

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausscheiden von Fremdstoffen in Fasermaterial, insbesondere in Rohbaumwolle

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour éliminer les corps étrangers de la matière fibreuse, en particulier du coton brut

Publication

EP 0989214 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810885 A

Priority

EP 98810885 A

Abstract (en)

To separate dirt and impurities and other debris from fiber materials, and especially raw cotton, a sensor system (2) is used to detect the foreign matter in the fiber flow channel (1) carried in an air stream. The sensor triggers a mechanism to eject the foreign matter by air bursts to blow it through an opening (7) into a waste collection container (8). The sensor system (2) to detects foreign matter in the fiber flow channel (1) carried in an air stream. The sensor triggers a mechanism to eject the foreign matter by air bursts to blow it through an opening (7) into a waste collection container (8). The volume of the waste collection container (8) is increased at least during the duration of an air pulse, or air is extracted from the container (8) through an air suction opening (11). An air movement system is activated to extract a volume of air from the collection container (8), and the extracted air is returned to the fiber flow channel (1) or it is passed into an outflow channel (20). An underpressure source is connected to the waste collection container, for the air extraction by suction. The volume increase or air extraction at the waste collection container (8) is triggered by the sensor system (2), and the action is maintained for the duration of a compressed air burst. An Independent claim is included for a fiber cleaning assembly, where the waste collection container (8) has a system to increase its volume or extract air (14) from it temporarily, to compensate for the volume of air blown into it while foreign matter is ejected from the fiber flow channel. Preferred Features: The waste collection container (8) is linked to the underpressure source through a controlled barrier (15). A control (12) activates the operating units, in response to signals from the sensor system (2). At least one flow guide plate (10) is within the waste collection container (8).

Abstract (de)

In einer Fasertransportleitung (1) wird das Fasermaterial in Transportrichtung hintereinander an einem Sensorsystem (2) und einer Ausscheidevorrichtung (5) vorbeigeführt. Beim Erkennen von Fremdstoffen durch das Sensorsystem wird die verunreinigte Teilmenge des Fasermaterials mittels eines quer zur Fasertransportleitung gerichteten Luftdruckimpulses (b) in einen Ausscheidebehälter (8) umgelenkt, der über eine Ausscheideöffnung (7) mit der Fasertransportleitung verbunden ist. Der Ausscheidebehälter ist gegenüber der Atmosphäre weitgehend druckdicht ausgebildet. Für die Kompensation der in den Ausscheidebehälter (8) eingeleiteten Luftmenge wird wenigstens während der Dauer des Gasdruckimpulses entweder das Volumen des Ausscheidebehälters vergrössert oder über eine Luftabzugsöffnung im Ausscheidebehäler Luft abgezogen. Dadurch werden Turbulenzen im Ausscheidebehälter und ein Rückströmen der verdrängten Luft über die Ausscheideöffnung verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 31/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989214 A1 20000329; EP 0989214 B1 20030423; DE 59808078 D1 20030528

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070907

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-12-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061201

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-30 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-04-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HUBERT A. HERGETH

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-10-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808078

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020619

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI