Global Patent Index - EP 0989216 B1

EP 0989216 B1 2004-12-01 - Manufacturing method of geogrid

Title (en)

Manufacturing method of geogrid

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für in Erdbau anwendbarem Gitter

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la fabrication de géogrilles

Publication

EP 0989216 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98118203 A

Priority

EP 98118203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989216A1] An improved method for manufacturing polymeric geogrids is disclosed. The method includes the steps of: (a) co-spinning at least one high-melting point filament yarn with a plurality of low-melting point staple fibers to form a composite yarn, the low-melting point staple fiber has a melting point that is at least 10 SIMILAR 20 DEG C lower than the melting point of the high-melting point filament yarn; (b) weaving the composite yarn to form a net-structured fabrics; (c) heating the net-structured fabrics to cause the low-melting point staple fiber to melt and wrap about the high-melting point filament yarn; and (d) cooling the net-structured to form a geogrid. One of the main advantages of this process is that it does not require the coating step (with molten PVC or asphalt), as do the prior art processes. Thus, the geogrids can be manufactured in a more cost-effective and environmentally compatible manner. The geogrid of the present invention also exhibits substantially increased junction strength as well as retaining a greater portion of its ultimate strength at elongation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 9/00; D03D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 9/00 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 9/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0011 (2013.01); D03D 15/0027 (2013.01); D10B 2101/06 (2013.01); D10B 2101/12 (2013.01); D10B 2321/021 (2013.01); D10B 2321/022 (2013.01); D10B 2321/06 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01); D10B 2331/04 (2013.01); D10B 2401/063 (2013.01); D10B 2505/204 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989216 A1 20000329; EP 0989216 B1 20041201; AT 283938 T 20041215; DE 69827943 D1 20050105; DE 69827943 T2 20051222

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69827943 P 20050105

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HU, YEN-JUNG,C/OINDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PERNG,PUNG-NIEN,C/O INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHIANG,TIEN-PAO,C/O INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHENG, SHI-CHIEH J.,C/O INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020930

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI