Global Patent Index - EP 0989228 A1

EP 0989228 A1 2000-03-29 - Vegetable material from cereal plants and process for making the same

Title (en)

Vegetable material from cereal plants and process for making the same

Title (de)

Pflanzliches Material aus Getreidepflanzen und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Matériau à base de matière végétale issue de plantes céréalières et procédé d'obtention

Publication

EP 0989228 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402274 A

Priority

FR 9811966 A

Abstract (en)

To prepare a material of vegetable matter using at least one cereal plant, the upper parts of the plants are chopped into fragments, or a substantial fraction of the upper parts. The fragments are crushed or sheared into granules of 0.01-10.0 mm. The moisture content of the granules is set to a level of 10-35%, and the granules are used for the material. The granules are dried to give a residual moisture content of 5-20% before crushing or shearing. After the water content of the granules has been adjusted, they are extruded into the required material. The granule size in the composition is preferably where 5-50% are 0.25 mm, 5-40% are 0.25-0.5 mm, 15-60% are 0.5-1.0 mm, 1-10% are 1.0-1,25 mm, 0.5-7.0% are 1.25-1.4 mm, 1-10% are 1.4-1.7 mm, 0.1-10.0% are 1.7-2.36 mm, 0-10% are 2.36 mm. The cereal plants are maize or wheat. The cereal plants are chopped into fragments with a length of 0.5-10.0 cm. The material can be injected into a mold. Independent claims is included for: (a) cereal plant granules which, in dry weight, contain 20-60 wt% starch, 3-20 wt% proteins, 15-60 wt% cellulose and hemicellulose and lignin, 1-15 wt% lipids and 0.01-10.0 wt% sugar; and (b) a material with a vegetable base with a tensile strength of at least 10 N/mm<2> and a bending module of at least 1500 N/mm<2>. Preferred Features: The material has a bending resistance of at least 20 N/mm<2> and a bending module of at least 1500 N/mm<2>. The material is hollow, solid or profiled.

Abstract (fr)

Ce matériau peut être préparé par un procédé comprenant le découpage en fragments des parties aériennes de la plante, le broyage ou le cisaillement des fragments jusqu'à l'obtention de granulats, l'ajustement de la teneur en eau des granulats et la mise en forme du matériau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989228 A1 20000329; FR 2783740 A1 20000331; FR 2783740 B1 20001215; US 6207196 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI