Global Patent Index - EP 0989230 A1

EP 0989230 A1 2000-03-29 - Method and device for keeping clean or cleaning the low consistency line of a headbox system

Title (en)

Method and device for keeping clean or cleaning the low consistency line of a headbox system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinhaltung beziehungsweise Reinigung des Niederkonsistenzstrangs eines Stoffauflaufsystems

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour tenir propre ou pour nettoyer le conduit de la faible consistance d'un système de caisse de tête

Publication

EP 0989230 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112924 A

Priority

DE 19843728 A

Abstract (en)

To maintain the purity or to clean the low consistency flow at a stock inlet, at a machine for the production of paper or cardboard, the low consistency flow is given an increased proportion of solid particles. As the ratio of solid particles is increased in the low consistency flow, the solid content of the high consistency flow is reduced, where the sum total of the increased solids in the low consistency flow equals the solid reduction in the high consistency flow. The mass of increased solids at a section in the low consistency flow matches the mass of reduced solids in this section of the high consistency flow. The shifts in the amounts of solids between the high and low consistency flows are varied by volume control between the two flows, and between the same section in the two flows. The solid particles are fibers, and preferably long fibers of wood or plastics, with a high cleaning action. The solids are added to the low consistency flow continuously or at intervals. An Independent claim is included for a stock inlet with a pulp density control in sections across the machine width, with a high consistency (1) and a low consistency (2) flow. At least one feed (3) opens into the low consistency flow (2) to deliver solid particles into the flow of suspension. Preferred Features: The low consistency flow (2) has a number of feeds in sections where each of the feeds (3.1) delivers solid particles. A feed system delivers solid particles to sections of the high consistency flow (1). Each feed (3,3.1) for the solid particles has a control valve (7) to set the volume of delivered solids.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Reinhaltung beziehungsweise Reinigung des Niederkonsistenzstrangs eines stoffdichtegeregelten Stoffauflaufsystems einschließlich Konstantem Teil einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine mit mindestens einem Hochkonsistenzstrang und einem - gegebenenfalls sektionierten - Niederkonsistenzstrang, wobei die vom Stoffauflauf auf ein Sieb oder zwischen zwei Siebe gegebene Endkonzentration durch das Mischungsverhältnis von höherkonzentrierter und niederkonzentrierter Suspensionsströme bestimmt wird. Das Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß dem Niederkonsistenzstrang ein erhöhter Anteil von Festteilchen zugeführt wird. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung ein Stoffauflaufsystem einschließlich Konstantem Teil einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine mit über die Maschinenbreite sektionierter Stoffdichteregelung durch variable Mischung einer höherkonsistenten und einer niederkonsistenten Suspension, mit einem Hochkonsistenzstrang (1) und einem Niederkonsistenzstrang (2). Das Stoffauflaufsystem ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß im Niederkonsistenzstrang (2) mindestens eine Zuführung (3) zur Einleitung von Feststoffteilchenanteilen in den Suspensionsstrom vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/08; D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989230 A1 20000329; EP 0989230 B1 20031217; AT 256782 T 20040115; DE 19843728 A1 20000330; US 6214170 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908079

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120706

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 256782 T

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908079 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI