Global Patent Index - EP 0989232 A2

EP 0989232 A2 2000-03-29 - Drying section

Title (en)

Drying section

Title (de)

Trockenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de séchage

Publication

EP 0989232 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112926 A

Priority

DE 19841768 A

Abstract (en)

The drying station (12) for a wet fiber web (14) has at least one deflection flow dryer (16), where the web (14) is subjected to a deflected hot air and/or hot steam flow at least at one side.

Abstract (de)

Eine Trockenpartie 12 einer Maschine zur Herstellung einer Materialbahn 14, wie insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, umfaßt wenigstens einen Prallströmungstrockner (16), durch den die Materialbahn (14) zumindest einseitig mit einer Heißluft- und/oder Heißdampfprallströmung beaufschlagbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2006.01); D21F 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/182 (2013.01); D21F 5/00 (2013.01); D21F 5/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6294050 B1 20010925; DE 19841768 A1 20000316; EP 0989232 A2 20000329; EP 0989232 A3 20010110; EP 0989232 B1 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100705

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909306

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-07-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909306 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI