Global Patent Index - EP 0989232 A3

EP 0989232 A3 2001-01-10 - Drying section

Title (en)

Drying section

Title (de)

Trockenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de séchage

Publication

EP 0989232 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112926 A

Priority

DE 19841768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6294050B1] Drying end of a machine for the production of a material web such as paper or cardboard. The drying end includes at least one impact flow drier configured to bombard at least one surface of the material web with hot air or hot steam impact flow. Also provided is a method for drying a material web including bombarding the material web on at least one surface with hot air or hot steam impact flow, via at least one impact flow drier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2006.01); D21F 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/182 (2013.01); D21F 5/00 (2013.01); D21F 5/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6294050 B1 20010925; DE 19841768 A1 20000316; EP 0989232 A2 20000329; EP 0989232 A3 20010110; EP 0989232 B1 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100705

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909306

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-07-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909306 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI