Global Patent Index - EP 0989233 A3

EP 0989233 A3 2000-12-27 - Drying section and convection dryer for such a drying section

Title (en)

Drying section and convection dryer for such a drying section

Title (de)

Trockenpartie sowie Konvektionstrockner für eine solche Trockenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de séchage et sécheur à convection pour une telle section de séchage

Publication

EP 0989233 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113191 A

Priority

DE 19841767 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989233A2] The web drying section, at a papermaking or cardboard production machine, has at least one convection drier (10). It has at least one drying section (18-24) where the web (12) moves between two permeable fourdriniers (26-34) for hot air and/or hot steam to pass through it from one or both sides. The convection drier (10) has at least one straight or slightly curved drying section (18-24) on the direction (L) of web travel. It can have at least two drying sections (18-22), over each other or in succession. At least one drying section (18-24) is formed between two drying or jet hoods (36,36'-42,42'). The hoods have a steam or air suction extraction. The web (12) is enclosed at the sides, at least partially by the convection drier (10). The heaters at the drying sections (18-24) are controlled separately, at least partially, to set the heating levels. The convection drier (10) has at least one drying section (18-24) divided into zones across the direction (L) of web (12) travel. The web (12) has an enclosed travel path through the convection drier (10). The web deflection between the drying sections (18-24) is through suction rollers (44-50), which take the web (12) from the preceding fourdriniers (26,28,32,30). The hot air and/or hot steam applied to the web (12) in at least one drying section (18-24) is at a temp. of 150-450 degrees C, and especially at 200-400 degrees C, and at a flow speed of 60-120 m/s, especially 100 m/s. The convection drier (10) is located in front of a drying group of cylinders in one or two rows. On reaching the first drying cylinder (14), the web (12) has been dried to a dry content level of 55-65%. The convection drier (10) is placed after one or more cylinders or at least one web guide roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/18 (2013.01); D21F 5/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841767 A1 20000316; EP 0989233 A2 20000329; EP 0989233 A3 20001227; EP 0989233 B1 20041013; US 6237248 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100708

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910817

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070709

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910817 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020912

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI