Global Patent Index - EP 0989234 A3

EP 0989234 A3 2000-11-15 - Doctor blade

Title (en)

Doctor blade

Title (de)

Schaber

Title (fr)

Couteau racleur

Publication

EP 0989234 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111853 A

Priority

DE 19841637 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989234A2] The scraper assembly, to clean the mantle surface of a rotating roller in a machine for the production and/or finishing of a fiber web has at least one sensor (7) to register the setting of the scraper blade (9) and/or scraper holder (8). It is linked to a control (6) to move a unit out of danger which could be affected by a scraper malfunction and/or the damaged unit. Where the system is at a papermaking press roller (4), on a malfunction of the scraper the control acts on the transfer of the web (1) from a roller (10) at a preceding station, by swinging the roller clear, and interrupt the web transfer action. On a malfunction, the scraper is swung clear of the roller (4) being cleaned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2006.01); D21G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2013.01); D21G 3/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841637 A1 20000316; EP 0989234 A2 20000329; EP 0989234 A3 20001115; EP 0989234 B1 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-07-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909307 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030410

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI