Global Patent Index - EP 0989235 A1

EP 0989235 A1 2000-03-29 - Web guiding system

Title (en)

Web guiding system

Title (de)

Bahnführung

Title (fr)

Systéme de guidage de bande

Publication

EP 0989235 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111840 A

Priority

DE 19841639 A

Abstract (en)

In the movement path of a fiber web (1), at a papermaking or finishing machine, a transfer zone (2) is formed where the web (1) is moved between moving units (3,4) such as a metal belt (3) and a blanket (4). The run of the web (1) is monitored after the transfer zone (2), and an incorrect movement path is adjusted. The run of the web (1) is monitored optically. On detection of an incorrect alignment, a mechanical setting mechanism (5) is activated. The monitor has at least one sensor (6) which can receive optical signals, on the path of the web (1) after the transfer zone (2). The sensor (6) is linked to a control (7), which activates the mechanical path adjustment unit (5). The mechanical unit (5) to adjust the web (1) path alignment has a controlled scraper and/or brush and/or compressed air jet acting on the surface of the transferring unit (3). Or it is a suction system acting on the permeable pick-up unit (4). The units (3,4), where the web (1) is transferred between them, are belts, blankets, fourdriniers or rotating rollers. The transfer zone (2) is between different units (3,4), where the web is moved from one to the other.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren sowie die dazugehörige Vorrichtung zur Bahnführung in Maschinen zur Herstellung und/oder Veredelung von Faserstoffbahnen (1) wie Papier-, Karton- oder Tissuebahnen angewendet, wobei die Faserstoffbahn (1) in einem Übergabebereich (2) zwischen zwei mitlaufenden, auf jeweils einer anderen Seile der Faserstoffbahn (1) angeordneten Elementen (3, 4) übergeben wird. Eine einfache und sichere Bahnführung wird dabei dadurch erreicht, daß der Verlauf der Faserstoffbahn (1) nach dem Übergabebereich (2) überwacht und ein falscher Verlauf korrigiert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00; D21F 2/00; D21F 7/04; D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2006.01); D21F 7/04 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0063 (2013.01); D21F 2/00 (2013.01); D21F 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841639 A1 20000316; EP 0989235 A1 20000329; EP 0989235 B1 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040620

2004-06-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040619

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-07-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030703

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905045

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI