Global Patent Index - EP 0989237 A2

EP 0989237 A2 2000-03-29 - Bollard

Title (en)

Bollard

Title (de)

Strassenbake

Title (fr)

Balise de voirie légère

Publication

EP 0989237 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99402337 A

Priority

FR 9812010 A

Abstract (en)

The marker consists of an indicator (1) with a base (2) mounted on a support (5), either fixed or retractable. The indicator has an elongated body with an outer hollow shell (3) of impermeable plastic material, filled with cellular material that is denser towards the base than at the top of the indicator. The base has an under surface designed to be stuck to the support, and an upper surface shaped for fixing to the body shell, which has at least one zone with reduced resistance to flexure.

Abstract (fr)

Balise de voirie comprenant un voyant (1) destiné, en service, à être en saillie au-dessus du niveau de la chaussée (5) et un socle (2) de fixation du voyant à un support (5, 17), le voyant (1) étant formé d'un corps allongé comprenant une enveloppe extérieure (3) en matière plastique étanche et un remplissage interne (4) en matériau alvéolaire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/011

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E01F 9/018 (2006.01); E01F 9/019 (2006.01); E01F 13/04 (2006.01); E01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/003 (2013.01); E01F 9/638 (2016.02); E01F 9/646 (2016.02); E01F 9/675 (2016.02); E01F 13/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989237 A2 20000329; EP 0989237 A3 20020807; FR 2783849 A1 20000331; FR 2783849 B1 20001124

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050119

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01F 9/011 A, 7E 01F 9/018 B

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI