Global patent index - EP 0989241 A1

EP 0989241 A1 2000-03-29 - Method for forming concrete piles in the ground

Title (en)

Method for forming concrete piles in the ground

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Ortbetonpfahles im Boden

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de pieux en béton dans le sol

Publication

EP 0989241 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203265 A

Priority

EP 98203265 A

Abstract (en)

A method for installing concrete piles in the soil, wherein a hole is made in the soil by forcing a soil displacement head (11), fixed to a tubular rod (12), either by ramming or screwing into the soil thereby laterally displacing the soil over a distance larger than the diameter of the tubular rod (12) to form a cavity (13) around the tubular rod (12), at least the tubular rod (12) is withdrawn from the hole, and, when withdrawing the tubular rod, concrete is injected through this rod into the hole to form the concrete pile therein. In order to prevent contaminants, which may be present is a higher soil layer, from penetrating to deeper soil layers, a liquid material (18) is injected at the bottom in said cavity (13) to keep it filled therewith when screwing or ramming the soil displacement head into the soil. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989241 A1 20000329; EP 0989241 B1 20050112; DE 69828604 D1 20050217

INPADOC legal status

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-04-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRANKI FOUNDATIONS BELGIUM, EN ABREGE "F.F.B."

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120930

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110826

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FRANKI FOUNDATIONS BELGIUM, BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-12-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FRANKI FOUNDATIONS BELGIUM, BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110830

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-09 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20111025

2011-11-09 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20111025

2011-09-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *FRANKI FOUNDATIONS BELGIUM, EN ABREGE "F.F.B."

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20110909

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050924

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2005-04-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69828604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020320

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI