Global patent index - EP 0989249 A3

EP 0989249 A3 2001-02-07 - Awning assembly

Title (en)

Awning assembly

Title (de)

Vordachkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Auvent

Publication

EP 0989249 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118657 A

Priority

DE 19844174 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0989249A2] In the area of the side wall or facade (61) opposite ends of the roof surface (10) are provided with one or more columns (4). Water running away from the roof surface feeds into a collecting device supported by the columns or the roof surface. At least one column has a conduit (41) which conducts the water away vertically. The roof surface in the area of the facade or side wall is supported by the side wall or an upright (64). The collecting device (30) is formed as a channel supported by the column and is provided with one or more apertures (31) which feed the water into the vertical conduit (41). The building (50) has a foundation-type floor plate (63) which is of one-part structure with the foundation (40) of the column.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 7/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/064 (2006.01); E04D 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/08 (2013.01); E04B 1/0046 (2013.01); E04B 7/00 (2013.01); E04D 13/0645 (2013.01); E04D 2013/0806 (2013.01); E04D 2013/084 (2013.01); E04D 2013/0893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989249 A2 20000329; EP 0989249 A3 20010207; DE 19844174 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI