Global Patent Index - EP 0989256 A1

EP 0989256 A1 2000-03-29 - Working method and cleaning apparatus for cleaning a swimming-pool

Title (en)

Working method and cleaning apparatus for cleaning a swimming-pool

Title (de)

Arbeitsverfahren und Reinigungsgerät zum Reinigen eines Schwimmbeckens

Title (fr)

Procédé de travail et appareil de nettoyage pour nettoyer une piscine

Publication

EP 0989256 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117503 A

Priority

CH 194098 A

Abstract (en)

Motors are provided for left and right-hand side movement mechanism parts. A control device controls the movement mechanism with front and rear side contact devices for production of control signals in the event of the cleaning unit (2) coming into contact with the swimming pool wall (3) or an obstruction. The control device for each movement mechanism part has a speed regulating device and equipment for a differential control of the speed of the two motors. The cleaning unit on both movement mechanism parts has devices for measurement of the distances (d1,d2) covered during the backward and forward movement. The control device calculates the direction alteration angle (R1,R2) for the moving cleaning unit on the basis of the measured covered distances. The control device also calculates a width (v) of the movement path and controls it differentially.

Abstract (de)

Ein in einem Schwimmbecken (1) hin- und herfahrendes Reinigungsgerät (2) weist ein auf Vorwärts- oder auf Rückwärtsfahrt umschaltbares Fahrwerk mit je einem Motor für einen links- und einen rechtsseitigen Fahrwerkteil sowie eine Steuereinrichtung zur Steuerung des Fahrwerkes auf. Die Steuereinrichtung weist für jeden Fahrwerkteil eine Geschwindigkeitsregeleinrichtung auf und hat Mittel zur differentiellen Steuerung der Geschwindigkeit der beiden Motoren. Das Reinigungsgerät hat an beiden Fahrwerkteilen Mittel zur Messung der beim Hin- und Herfahren zurückgelegten Distanzen (d1,d2). Die Richtungsänderungswinkel (R1,R2) werden von der Steuereinrichtung aufgrund der gemessenen zurückgelegten Distanzen(d1,d2) und einer Versatzbreite (v) der jeweiligen Fahrspuren berechnet und differentiell gesteuert. Der Vorteil des Steuerungsverfahrens besteht darin, dass Richtungsänderungswinkel genau ausgeführt und Schwimmbecken beliebiger Form zuverlässig gereinigt werden können <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/00 (2006.01); E04H 4/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/1654 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989256 A1 20000329; EP 0989256 B1 20031119; AT 254711 T 20031215; DE 59907788 D1 20031224; ES 2210925 T3 20040701; JP 2000093360 A 20000404; US 6309468 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *3S SYSTEMTECHNIK A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *3S SYSTEMTECHNIK A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210925 T3

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907788 P 20031224

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI