Global Patent Index - EP 0989263 A1

EP 0989263 A1 2000-03-29 - Electric lock with opening assistance for motor vehicle doors

Title (en)

Electric lock with opening assistance for motor vehicle doors

Title (de)

Elektrisches Schloss mit kraftunterstütztem Öffnen für Kraftfahrzeugtüren

Title (fr)

Serrure électrique à assitance à l'ouverture pour portière de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0989263 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401911 A

Priority

FR 9811742 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has two compartments opposite sides of a common base (15) extending over the whole area of the lock case (B). A control lever (11), mounted on a stub shaft passing through the base and rotating a catch, releasing the bolt, in the other compartment, is actuated by a peg fixed under a toothed wheel (22), as the wheel rotates. The wheel is driven, via a worm gear, by a geared motor (16) energized on the initial movement of a cable (C) which operates a micro-switch (60), the cable being connected to the exterior door handle. The interior door handle acts directly on the catch. If the opening motor (16), or its supply, is defective, the door can be opened by continued movement of the exterior handle, via a cable end-stop (36), which transmits the effort to the control lever (11) through a pivoted (33) emergency lever (32); however, when the door is locked the locking lever (41) disengages the end-stop from the forked end of the emergency lever. The locking motor also responds to the usual external remote control.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure électrique pour portière de véhicule automobile, comportant un boîtier de serrure (B) dont un premier compartiment contient un pêne, et un cliquet, et dont un deuxième compartiment (15) contient de manière étanche un levier de condamnation (41) apte à mettre la serrure en position condamnée/décondamnée, et un moteur électrique (16) pour l'assistance à l'ouverture, apte à entraîner un levier d'ouverture extérieure pour actionner le cliquet vers sa position de libération du pêne, en réponse à un signal de commande d'ouverture extérieure émis par un contacteur d'ouverture extérieure (60), lorsqu'un moyen de commande extérieure est actionné par un utilisateur, caractérisée par le fait qu'elle comporte un moyen mécanique de liaison extérieure (C) dont une portion extérieure est destinée à être reliée au moyen de commande et dont une autre portion intérieure s'étend dans le deuxième compartiment, ledit contacteur étant disposé dans ledit deuxième compartiment sur le trajet de ladite portion intérieure du moyen de liaison, de façon à émettre un signal de commande d'ouverture extérieure, lorsque le moyen de liaison est déplacé sur une course d'ouverture déterminée lors de l'actionnement du moyen de commande. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01); E05B 85/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0989263 A1 20000329; EP 0989263 B1 20060712; DE 69932299 D1 20060824; DE 69932299 T2 20070705; ES 2268836 T3 20070316; FR 2783552 A1 20000324; FR 2783552 B1 20001117

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20160428

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S., CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 69932299

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69932299

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2268836 T3

2007-02-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-10-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932299 P 20060824

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI